Trustees EXETER CITY SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1112308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Michelle O'Reilly Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
James Andrew Wayland Trustee 03 December 2024
None on record
John Clements Trustee 01 May 2024
EXETER CITY SWIMMING CLUB
Recently registered
John Martin Walters Trustee 23 February 2023
EXETER CITY SWIMMING CLUB
Recently registered
Cleofe Louise Board Trustee 20 December 2022
EXETER CITY SWIMMING CLUB
Recently registered
Louis Alexander Joyce Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record
Kate Louise Vain Trustee 01 March 2022
None on record