H S GREWAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
H S GREWAL CHARITABLE TRUST was constituted to assist funding to open an institution to provide both services of education and health to the public within and around the surroundings areas of the Village of Sarabha, Punjab, India.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Southampton City
- India
Governance
- 18 May 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HOSIAR SINGH GREWAL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SARABHJIT SINGH GREWAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2025 | 349 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 February 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DATED 25 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF PEOPLE IN THE LUDIHANA DISTRICT OF THE PUNJAB, INDIA BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION FOR MEDICAL STUDENTS ATTENDING THE SHAHEED KARTAR SINGH SARABHA MEDICAL COLLEGE AND HOSPITAL AND PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT FOR THE SHAHEED KARTAR SINGH SARABHA HOSPITAL NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
LUDIHANA DISTRICT OF THE PUNJAB, INDIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 RAYMOND ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 5AL
- Phone:
- 02380233346
- Email:
- sabigrewal@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window