Trustees HANSLOPE COMBINED SCHOOL FUND
Charity number: 1109039

Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Guy Crowther STACEY | Chair | 16 November 2012 |
|
|||||
Arran Collins | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucille Gregory | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam Johnson | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan James Garner | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Lovegood | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Lawrence | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bethany Metcalf | Trustee | 02 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
RYAN FENSHAM BROWN | Trustee | 05 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
FRANCES DUCK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.