Financial history HOME-START WINCHESTER AND DISTRICTS

Charity number: 1108170
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £85.35k £76.31k £96.96k £110.84k £137.38k
Total expenditure £89.73k £76.97k £95.16k £110.65k £122.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.65k £7.79k £16.92k £11.63k £10.61k