HOME-START WINCHESTER AND DISTRICTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer support, friendship and practical help to parents with young children who are going through difficult times, e.g. isolation, ill-health, relationship difficulties, coping with twins or triplets, lone parenting, first time parenthood and children's behavioural problems, achieved through a combination of home-visting support by trained volunteers, group work and social events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,605 from 3 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Hampshire
Governance
- 17 February 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan BARHAM | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susan Charlene THOMAS | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert White | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert John BOLWELL | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane SKELTON | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Elizabeth CHAPMAN-ANDREWS | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary NORTH | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Joy DURRANT | Trustee | 27 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Carol Sumner | Trustee | 28 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE MARY BARLOW | Trustee | 26 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Tomsett | Trustee | 17 November 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.35k | £76.31k | £96.96k | £110.84k | £137.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.73k | £76.97k | £95.16k | £110.65k | £122.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.65k | £7.79k | £16.92k | £11.63k | £10.61k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 FEBRUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
(A) TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; (B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; (D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILDCARE WITHIN THE AREA OF WINCHESTER AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
WINCHESTER AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CARROLL CENTRE
SOMERS CLOSE
WINCHESTER
HAMPSHIRE
SO22 4EJ
- Phone:
- 01962 851177
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window