Financial history THE ASSOCIATION OF THE ANTIOCHIAN ORTHODOX PARISH OF CENTRAL LONDON

Charity number: 1108200
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £34.12k £37.77k £36.92k £39.33k £27.89k
Total expenditure £35.64k £25.26k £39.37k £36.05k £33.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.46k £974 £5.15k £5.67k