MUKTI TRUST

Charity Number: 1109198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The relief of poverty hardship and distress within India and elsewhere throughout the world,among orhphaned or disadvantaged girls under the age of 22, by provision of accomodation and support or such other exclusively charitable means as the trustees shall from time to time determine.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £23,921
Total expenditure: £40,029

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • India

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 April 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
shobhna Shah Chair
None on record
Premila Pindolia Trustee 19 June 2019
None on record
Nimish Chandrakant Patel Trustee 11 June 2014
None on record
SUNANDA PIERIS Trustee
None on record
Dr REENA SHAH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £30.12k £21.45k £8.06k £38.39k £23.92k
Total expenditure £46.67k £0 £42.09k £20.09k £40.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 29 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 30 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 30 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 25 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 12 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 30 March 2021 120 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
50 CRAIGWEIL AVENUE
RADLETT
WD7 7EY
Phone:
07973745956