SOUTH MANCHESTER WILDLIFE RESCUE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue and rehabilitation of native British wildlife in the South Manchester and Stockport area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Manchester City
- Stockport
Governance
- 20 April 2005: Standard registration
- 09 June 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- SM WILDLIFE RESCUE (Working name)
- SMWR (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.81k | £2.70k | £4.43k | £1.77k | £1.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.07k | £262 | £3.28k | £2.22k | £1.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 13 August 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 30 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 OCTOBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 25 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ORPHANED, INJURED OR OTHERWISE DISTRESSED WILDLIFE AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE RESCUE AND PROVISION OF CARE AND REHABILITATION OF SUCH ANIMALS, AND TO RETURN ANIMAL TO THE WILDLIFE OR FIND A SUITABLE HOME. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON NATIVE BRITISH WILDLIFE WITH THE AIM OF ENCOURAGING TOLERANCE, APPRECIATION AND RESPECT FOR ALL WILDLIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window