THE HUGH CUDLIPP TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education and furthering the interests and standing of journalism by means of an annual lecture, open to the general public, and the making of an annual award to an individual student of journalism for published articles or another media project which has best furthered the aims of the trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 March 2005: Standard registration
- 05 August 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2009 | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.81k | £2.21k | £2.00k | £560 | £640 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.83k | £1.74k | £1.74k | £1.38k | £1.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 21 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 28 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2011 | 28 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND FURTHERING THE INTERESTS AND STANDING OF JOURNALISM BY; 1) SPONSORING AN ANNUAL HUGH CUDLIPP LECTURE, OPEN TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC, AT AN ACADEMIC SCHOOL OF JOURNALISM, DEDICATED TO EXPLORING ASPECTS OF THE ROLE OF COMMUNICATION IN CONTRIBUTING TOWARDS A BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF THE ISSUES, CHALLENGES AND PROBLEMS FACING SOCIETY. 2) MAKING AN ANNUAL AWARD TO AN INDIVIDUAL JOURNALISM STUDENT WHO HAS, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES, THROUGH AN ARTICLE, ARTICLES OR OTHER MEDIA PROJECT, MADE THE MOST OUTSTANDING CONTRIBUTION TO FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE TRUST.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window