TOPE OJO MEMORIAL WELFARE ORGANISATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help Nigerians in UK with financial problems who are not eligible for social welfare. We give Nigerian Students in UK grant towards tuition fees, feeding & accommodation. We support food-bank in Milton Keynes. We give aid to contribute towards Health improvement, Christian religious development & relief financial hardship in Nigeria. We provide amateur sport facilities in South Western Nigeria.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Nigeria
Governance
- 26 May 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Omolola Oluwatosin | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
ADEBOLA ANTHONY ADESIDA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY OJO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OLUWAKEMI OJO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER OLAJIDE ANIYI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.42k | £77.35k | £50.25k | £9.59k | £6.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.60k | £76.31k | £51.52k | £13.24k | £6.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 July 2024 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 July 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 August 2022 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 August 2022 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 August 2020 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 August 2020 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 AUGUST 2004, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 3 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS WHICH THE TRUSTEES DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 CLEGG SQUARE
SHENLEY LODGE
MILTON KEYNES
MK5 7HG
- Phone:
- 07958308965
- Email:
- topeojofoundation@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window