Financial history ASSOCIATION OF GHANAIAN EX-SERVICEMEN & WOMEN UK LTD

Charity number: 1108842
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/12/2020 30/12/2021 30/12/2022 30/12/2023 30/12/2024
Total gross income £6.91k £17.09k £8.38k £10.11k £8.18k
Total expenditure £3.11k £14.67k £25.84k £10.68k £8.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A