HAILE SELASSIE I PEACE FOUNDATION CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 17 September 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 21 June 2005: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- HSIPFC (Working name)
- SURVIVAL ULIMATE CHALLENGE THE HAILE SELASSIE I PEACE FOUNDATION CHARITY INC (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 17/09/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 17 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 17 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 17 September 2006 | 30 October 2007 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 17 September 2006 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JANUARY 2005 AS AMENDED 2 JUNE 2005.
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS BY ESTABLISHING A DROP IN CENTRE FOR ALL AGES WHEREBY SUCH PERSONS CAN ACCESS INFORMATION AND SUPPORT IN AN EFFORT TO INTEGRATE THEM INTO SOCIETY AND IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND THROUGH SUCH OTHER SERVICES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AFTER SCHOOL CLUBS; 3) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE IN HANDSWORTH AND SURROUNDING AREA AND TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION AND SOLUTION OF CRIME IN THE AREA; AND 4) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF PUBLIC HEALTH, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION IN TOPICS SUCH AS HEALTH AND SAFETY AND DRUG AWARENESS.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS, BIRMINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window