UK AND IRELAND CONTROLLED RELEASE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organisation of annual scientific meeting Organisation of sessions at annual UKPharmSci Conference Website of activities Annual member newsletter Essay competition held Travel awards given for the annual conference in US
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 21 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Helena Kelly | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Hoskins | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Gordon | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Michelle Mason | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dimitrios Lamprou | Trustee | 07 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sion Coulman | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
DR Maria Marlow | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR KARL MALCOLM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR MARGARET JAYNE LAWRENCE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.01k | £950 | £0 | £13.65k | £19.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.54k | £2.10k | £1.06k | £19.54k | £15.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 November 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 JANUARY 2005, AS AMENDED 14 MARCH 2005
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, AMONG HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS AND OTHERS, IN THE FIELD OF CONTROLLED RELEASE DRUG DELIVERY AND OTHER DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEMS BY THE CONDUCT OF SEMINARS, LECTURES AND OTHER MEETINGS AND BY THE COLLATION AND DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION IN A RANGE OF FORMATS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Upperton Pharma Solutions
11 Beeston Business Park
Technology Drive
Beeston
NOTTINGHAM
NG9 1LA
- Phone:
- 01158557050
- Email:
- laura.mason@upperton.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window