Financial history THE HUGH (ROBIN) STEVENS CHARITY

Charity number: 1108616
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £6.31k £843 £11.49k £16.65k £14.94k
Total expenditure £4.10k £26.45k £7.00k £2.04k £5.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A