INDIAN OCEAN DISASTER RELIEF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Initially building and operating an orphanage and related facilities in Sri Lanka together with emergency relief following the Tsunami disaster. The charity also contributes and supports charitable causes elsewhere in the Indian Ocean region, in particular following disasters in Myanmar, Indonesia, Pakistan and Haiti.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
- Haiti
- India
- Pakistan
- Philippines
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 28 February 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HARPAL SINGH MATHARU | Trustee | 01 February 2005 |
|
|
||||
RAJ SINGH MATHARU | Trustee | 01 February 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £727 | £363 | £24.37k | £6.24k | £1 | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.64k | £2.42k | £1.31k | £194.97k | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 15 November 2024 | 323 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 03 March 2023 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 July 2022 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 22 July 2022 | 570 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 FEBRUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING, AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, AMONGST CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTERS IN THE COUNTRIES AROUND THE INDIAN OCEAN BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT INCLUDING FOOD, CLOTHING AND MEDICAL ATTENTION. (2) TO FURTHER ANY PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RECOGNISED BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AS CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
THE COUNTRIES AROUND THE INDIAN OCEAN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
INDIAN OCEAN DISASTER RELIEF
58 ROCHESTER ROW
LONDON
SW1P 1JU
- Phone:
- 02076302000
- Email:
- info@iodr.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window