WILDLIFE VETS INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wildlife Vets International exists to apply specialist veterinary expertise to animal conservation projects, worldwide. This is achieved by training local vets and field biologists, undertaking research, investigating disease, assisting with project planning, and working in conjunction with NGOs and local communities to promote the conservation of rare and endangered species and their habitats.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Greece
- India
- Mauritius
- Nepal
- Spain
Governance
- 25 May 2005: Standard registration
- 23 May 2023: Funds received from 1091309 AMUR UK
- WVI (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Anna Louise Meredith OBE | Chair | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chantelle Brandwood | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Morrow | Trustee | 14 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Wildman Kettlewell | Trustee | 02 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ken Elliott | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr MIRANDA STEVENSON MBA | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER CHARLES COE | Trustee | 01 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.16k | £44.10k | £97.63k | £127.31k | £153.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £131.27k | £36.84k | £93.32k | £131.50k | £164.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JULY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 APRIL 2005. as amended on 23 Jul 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, OF THE CONSERVATION OF RARE AND ENDANGERED SPECIES AND THEIR HABITATS WORLDWIDE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF VETERINARY SERVICES.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wildlife Vets International
Station House
Parkwood Street
Keighley
WEST YORKSHIRE
BD21 4NQ
- Phone:
- 01535661298
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window