ARTES IBERIAN AND LATIN AMERICAN VISUAL CULTURAL GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The education of the public in the visual arts and culture of the Iberian Peninsula and Latin America, through lectures, conferences, publications, visits to exhibitions and sites, meetings, and contacts and links between people and groups with similar interests and aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 February 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr XANTHE BELLERBY BROOKE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Irini Picolou | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Patrick Jacques | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Daniel Sobrino Ralston | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claudia Hopkins | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Fernandez-Gonzalez | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emily Floyd | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Piers Alan Baker-Bates | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Symmons | Trustee | 21 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
TOM NICKSON | Trustee | 18 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN WILSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr MARJORIE HELENA TRUSTED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.02k | £11.25k | £11.01k | £12.59k | £12.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.51k | £10.46k | £10.46k | £9.59k | £11.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 JULY 2005. as amended on 13 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE VISUAL CULTURE OF THE IBERIAN PENINSULA AND LATIN AMERICA, BOTH WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS. VISUAL CULTURE INCLUDES (BUT IS NOT RESTRICTED TO) ARCHITECTURE, CERAMICS, DRAWINGS, FILM, METALWORK, PAINTINGS, PHOTOGRAPHY, PRINTS, SCULPTURE AND TEXTILES.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE UK AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 STADIUM STREET
LONDON
SW10 0PS
- Phone:
- 07538177188
- Email:
- artes@artes.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window