MUSLIM YOUTH HELPLINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our core service is a free and confidential emotional support service service available nationally via the telephone, email, web chat and letter. The service uses male and female volunteers trained in basic counselling skills to respond to client enquiries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
64 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 March 2005: Standard registration
- 28 November 2022: Funds received from 1139788 BLUE RIVER SUPPORT SERVICES
- MYH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yahya Delair | Trustee | 07 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ibrahim Peeran | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zahra Choudhry | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £122.37k | £189.83k | £301.99k | £217.51k | £353.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.16k | £168.41k | £143.46k | £215.55k | £275.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF OF YOUNG MUSLIMS WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF EMOTIONAL NEED, HARDSHIP AND MENTAL DISTRESS THROUGH CULTURALLY AWARE AND FAITH SENSITIVE COUNSELLING AND PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE AND FURTHER THE PROVISION OF TRAINING IN CULTURALLY AWARE AND FAITH SENSITIVE COUNSELLING. B) TO PROVIDE ADVICE TO YOUNG MUSLIMS WHOM BECAUSE OF THEIR INADEQUATE MEANS ARE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE FROM THEIR OWN RESOURCES. C) TO EDUCATE YOUNG MUSLIMS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR SPIRITUAL, MENTAL, EMOTIONAL, PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL CAPACITIES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
International House
12 Constance Street
LONDON
E16 2DQ
- Phone:
- 07753918487
- Email:
- info@myh.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window