THE HODDER VALLEY AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and encourgae the causes and aims of agriculture, horticulture, forestry and industry for the public benefit and to improve and advance them in all their branches and in all trades, crafts and professions connected with them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 March 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Mary Bennett | Chair | 09 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Neville Pearson | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Sharp | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Caroline Owen | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Robinson | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Neil Thornber | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Ann Johnson | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN BEATTIE | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|||||
EDWARD WILLIAM PARKINSON | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Audrey Spencer | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Jean Sandham | Trustee | 09 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Paul Marsden | Trustee | 09 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANN HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.73k | £8.28k | £8.82k | £48.78k | £66.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.80k | £6.71k | £5.45k | £38.20k | £40.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 10 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ADVANCE AND IMPROVE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, AGRICULTURE, HORTICULTURE, FORESTRY AND RURAL CRAFTS AND SKILLS IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES BY THE IMPROVEMENT OF LIVESTOCK AND THE DEMONSTRATION AND SHOWING OF LIVESTOCK, MACHINERY, CRAFTS, PRODUCTS, METHODS AND PROCESSES CONNECTED WITH AGRICULTURE AND AGRICULTURAL EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE CLITHEROE, LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HARROP HALL FARM
SLAIDBURN
CLITHEROE
LANCASHIRE
BB7 4TW
- Phone:
- 01200446698
- Email:
- julie.bennett@matthey.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window