PHOENIX SINGERS BIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mixed voice choral singing and giving concerts for the general public, as well as supporting a different charity each year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 13 June 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olivia Harrison | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Turner | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Williams | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Justine Bradshaw | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Simpson | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Alger | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Wright | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
SALLY PATRICIA POWELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.73k | £10.59k | £15.57k | £16.95k | £16.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.94k | £10.85k | £16.64k | £17.09k | £16.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MAY 2005,
Charitable objects
THE PUBLIC PERFORMANCE OF CHORAL MUSIC FOR THE PROMOTION IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 DUNCHURCH CRESCENT
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B73 6QN
- Phone:
- 07769742324
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window