OPPORTUNITIES WITHOUT LIMITS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
OWL provides work, learning and leisure opportunities for people who are learning disabled and/or disadvantaged - by community based social enterprise projects for work experience and accredited vocational training. On 5 October 2010 the assets, liabilities and operations of OWL were transferred to The Papworth Trust, registered charity number 211234.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 04 March 2005: Standard registration
- 16 October 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 16 October 2019: Funds transferred to 211234 THE PAPWORTH TRUST
- OWL (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 29 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 29 November 2017 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 24 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 DECEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING AND OTHER DISABILITIES OR DISADVANTAGES IN SAWSTON AND ELSEWHERE. THIS WILL BE PROVIDED IN PARTICULAR THROUGH: A. PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR WORK BASED THERAPY AND SUPPORTED EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES THROUGH THE OPERATION OF SOCIAL TRAINING ENTERPRISES. B. OFFERING RECOGNISED COURSES TO FACILITATE LEARNING. C. INTRODUCING PEOPLE TO A WIDE RANGE OF LEISURE ACTIVITIES AND PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES THAT ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN THE LIFE OF THEIR COMMUNITY IN WAYS WHICH ADDRESS AND ALLEVIATE THEIR DISABILITY/DISADVANTAGE. D. PROVIDING A HOT MEALS SERVICE IN SAWSTON AND SURROUNDING AREA TO THE ELDERLY AND INFIRM THAT CANNOT PREPARE A MEAL FOR THEMSELVES AND HAVE NO ONE ELSE TO DO SO FOR THEM. E. ARRANGING SUPPORTED HOUSING FACILITIES TO SUPPORT LIFESTYLE ASPIRATIONS OF USERS. F. TO ENABLE AND ASSIST PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND DISADVANTAGED TO SPEAK UP FOR THEMSELVES, TO SHARE THEIR IDEAS AND VOICE THEIR OPINIONS. G. TO PROMOTE THE ACCESS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND DISADVANTAGED INTO INTEGRATED SETTINGS, WHICH ARE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THEIR AIMS, AMBITIONS AND ASPIRATIONS. H. TO SHOW THE COMMUNITY WAYS IN WHICH IT CAN BE ENRICHED BY A DEEPER ACCEPTANCE AND UNDERSTANDING OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND DISADVANTAGES.
Area of benefit
SAWSTON AND ELSEWHERE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window