THE NIGHTINGALE TRUST FOR NUTRITIONAL SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing funding for training medical personnel in civilian hospitals nationally also funding training for military nursing staff for injured military personnel. Purchasing equipment to cascade training and items for education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 23 May 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DOCTOR JEREMY MARK DARBY NIGHTINGALE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Hardip Kaur Malhi | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Ann Fletcher | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Judi Anne Everatt Mrs | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Young | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Arun Abraham | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW RICHARD THOMAS | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02k | £0 | £10 | £995 | £19 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.49k | £315 | £0 | £0 | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2024 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 JAN 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 20 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS WITHIN THE UK AMONG THOSE REQUIRING PARENTERAL NUTRITION AND/OR NUTRITIONAL SUPPORT GENERALLY AS A RESULT OF ILLNESS INJURY OR OTHER CAUSES BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
WITHIN THE UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 24 Shortwood Court
Shortwood Business Park
Dearne Valley Parkway
Barnsley
S74 9LH
- Phone:
- 07754800669
- Email:
- info@nightingaletrust.com
- Website:
-
nightingaletrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window