Accounts and annual returns OXFAM INTERNATIONAL TSUNAMI FUND

Charity number: 1108700
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 12 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 12 June 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 11 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 12 August 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2006 11 September 2008 316 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 24 July 2007 On Time