THE ALETHEIA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation sets up funds to support and relieve the suffering of vulnerable contributors featured in films made by True Vision Productions (www.truevisiontv.com)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Eswatini
- India
- Kenya
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Uganda
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 20 June 2005: Standard registration
- THE ORPHANS OF NKANDLA TRUST (Previous name)
- THE TRUE VISION FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR BRIAN WOODS | Chair |
|
||||||
Nicky Wimble | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Annabelle Hall | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jezza Neumann | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.97k | £134.94k | £94.24k | £78.12k | £88.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.09k | £116.47k | £106.17k | £86.77k | £104.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 October 2024 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 October 2024 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 July 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 July 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 July 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 13 July 2020 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 11/05/2005 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 11/03/2010 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 23/03/2012
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY,PARTICULARLY IN THE DEVELOPING WORLD,BY PROVIDING:GRANTS,ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 108-109
Boundary House
Boston Road
London
W7 2QE
- Phone:
- 02087427852
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window