CHOPWELL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides community centre facilites to the local community and beyond. Room space is hired out to various organisations. Amongst other things it is used as a polling station, councillor meetings, resident groups, blood donor site. It was also used as a base for victims who were caught up in local flooding within the area last year. It depends on an annual Local Government grant.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
Total income includes £92,996 from 15 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
95 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 07 March 2005: Standard registration
- CHOPWELL COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL MCNESTRY | Chair | 20 March 2013 |
|
|||||
LYNNE CAFFREY | Trustee | 22 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Heslop | Trustee | 22 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.87k | £181.48k | £87.91k | £189.42k | £130.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.10k | £133.18k | £83.82k | £145.03k | £150.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.55k | £68.88k | £26.32k | £40.19k | £93.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 03 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN THE FACILITIES OF THE CHARITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS AND OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE INHABITANTS, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL AND PERSONAL EDUCATION, HEALTH AND WELFARE, RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME, ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
TYNE AND WEAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHOPWELL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
CHOPWELL COMMUNITY CENTRE
DERWENT STREET
CHOPWELL
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE17 7HS
- Phone:
- 01207562462
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window