HMM ARTS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education in the Arts by the establishment and maintenance of an arts centre for the benefit of children and young people. We provide workshops and activities for young people at our offices and in and around Shropshire and Telford & Wrekin.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £11,252 from 3 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 08 March 2005: Standard registration
- BELMONT ARTS CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helen Ball | Chair | 09 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Joel Hunt | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Katherine Marie Miller | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Louise Worrow | Trustee | 07 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luke Jones | Trustee | 04 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olha Voropai | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gloria June Partridge | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen O'Connor | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Slawson | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nathaniel Jacob Green | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN WILSON GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £448.13k | £352.26k | £338.14k | £255.57k | £313.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £378.57k | £320.89k | £332.12k | £326.67k | £371.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £105.94k | £166.80k | £144.28k | £39.83k | £11.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 6 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ARTS CENTRE FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE.
Area of benefit
SHROPSHIRE, TELFORD & WREKIN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE HIVE
5 BELMONT
SHREWSBURY
SY1 1TE
- Phone:
- 01743234970
- Email:
- admin@hiveonline.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window