THE DORCHESTER TRUST FOR COUNSELLING AND PSYCHOTHERAPY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
DTCP offers up to two years of therapy or counselling on a once a week basis to those people living within travelling distance of Dorchester who cannot afford a private fee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 19 May 2005: Standard registration
- DTCP (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dave McRobbie | Chair | 29 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nancy Castle | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Davina Talyor | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Edmondson | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Spenceley | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Lakins | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.11k | £25.33k | £23.78k | £16.64k | £17.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.68k | £25.64k | £19.24k | £15.80k | £17.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £5.30k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 APRIL 2005,
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS IN DORCHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS OF DORSET, SOUTH SOMERSET AND EAST DEVON, WHO ARE IN NEED OF PSYCHOTHERAPY AND/OR COUNSELLING, BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN MEETING THE COSTS OF TREATMENT AND BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE ON ACCESSING SERVICES VIA THE NHS OR OTHER BODIES.
Area of benefit
DORCHESTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS OF DORSET, SOUTH SOMERSET AND EAST DEVON,
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Key Digital Agency Ltd
Stowey House
Bridport Road
Poundbury
DORCHESTER
Dorset
- Phone:
- 07714 330120
- Email:
- collitonst@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
dtcp.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window