Financial history THE PROJECT AFRICAN WILDERNESS TRUST

Charity number: 1108662
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2011 30/04/2012 30/04/2013 30/04/2014 30/04/2015
Total gross income £96.16k £31.04k £1.15k £0 £0
Total expenditure £96.52k £35.23k £3.23k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A