THE PROJECT AFRICAN WILDERNESS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PAW Trust supports and promotes environmental conservation in wilderness areas, particularily Mwabvi Wildlife Reserve in Malawi. It provides employment, ecotourist facilities, training and education opportunities for local people and international visitors. The UK Trust oversees the formal agreement with the Government of Malawi, fund-raising, practical support and promotional activity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Malawi
Governance
- 21 March 2005: Standard registration
- 05 July 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PAW (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2011 | 30/04/2012 | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.16k | £31.04k | £1.15k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.52k | £35.23k | £3.23k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | 20 July 2017 | 507 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 APRIL 2004
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO: (A) ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN HOLISTIC RESOURCES MANAGEMENT WITH REGARD TO THE MWABVI GAME RESERVE AND ASSOCIATED WILDLIFE MANAGEMENT AND RURAL DEVELOPMENT AREAS IN EAST AND CENTRAL AFRICA (B) SECURE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION, RESTORATION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE WORLD'S ANIMAL, BIRD, FISH AND PLANT LIFE, ITS INDUSTRIAL, URBAN, RURAL NATURAL AND MARINE ENVIRONMENTS OF ECOLOGICAL OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE, AND ITS NATURAL RESOURCES BUT WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON THE MWABVI GAME RESERVE IN EAST AND CENTRAL AFRICA AND ITS ENVIRONS, AND ON OTHER ENVIRONMENTS IN MWABVI GAME RESERVE; (C) EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF NATURAL HISTORY ENVIRONMENT STUDIES, ECOLOGY AND RESOURCE CONSERVATION IN INDUSTRIAL URBAN, RURAL AND MARINE ENVIRONMENTS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; (D) PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION AND DEVELOPMENT OF OPPORTUNITIES AND RESOURCES FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN EAST AND CENTRAL AFRICA IN CONNECTION WITH THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISTRESS OR UNEMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
EAST AND CENTRAL AFRICA AND ANYWHERE ELSE IN THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window