The Johnson Family Charitable Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a grant making trust applying funds to charitable causes at the trustees discretion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 March 2005: Standard registration
- THE GUY JOHNSON CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- THE LADHAM CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GUY JOHNSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Pip Trustees Limited | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.00k | £75.00k | £47.82k | £20.72k | £45.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.93k | £93.29k | £54.21k | £55.27k | £129.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON 14TH JUNE 2001 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 7 OCTOBER 2008 as amended on 14 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO PAY THEREFROM ALL THE COSTS AND EXPENSES INCURRED BY THE TRUSTEES IN ESTABLISHING AND ADMINISTERING THE CHARITY AND THE TRUST FUND AND SUBJECT THERETO AS TO THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AS THE PATRON MAY BY NOTICE IN WRITING TO THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE, FOR OR TOWARDS SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES, AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTRUCTIONS, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE PROVIDED THAT IN SO ACTING THE TRUSTEES SHALL TAKE INTO ACCOUNT THE WISHES OF THE PATRON COMMUNICATED TO THEM IN WRITING FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILL VIEW HOUSE
THE HILL
CRANBROOK
KENT
TN17 3AD
- Phone:
- 01580801030
- Email:
- ImogenMurphy@amsbury.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window