WIDE HORIZONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian Faith and as an expression of Christian witness undertake: 1. the advancement of education and training 2. the provision and/or support of facilities in the interest of social welfare and/or recreation to strengthen and enhance the quality of family life and/or benefit the spiriyual, social and/or recreational welfare of the commumity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 07 March 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN PURDIE GILMOUR | Chair |
|
||||||||||
Paul Gilmour | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Rev DAVID SHEARER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.05k | £24.62k | £12.44k | £887 | £1.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.53k | £8.55k | £7.39k | £9.45k | £18.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 February 2024 | 212 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 25 January 2023 | 179 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 03 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 27 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION; B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; AND D) OTHER PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
STAFFORDSHIRE, WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
WHEATMOOR FARM
301 TAMWORTH ROAD
SUTTON COLDFIELD
B75 6JP
- Phone:
- 01213234993
- Email:
- widehorizons@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window