Financial history AMAT UK

Charity number: 1111057
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.12m £4.05m £3.74m £4.25m £3.88m
Total expenditure £4.05m £3.85m £3.84m £4.08m £3.96m
Income from government contracts £182.42k £184.91k N/A £400.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.00k £19.45k
Income - Donations and legacies £259.90k £267.84k £18.03k £74.23k £142.85k
Income - Other trading activities £12.43k £3.90k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £3.81m £3.74m £3.71m £4.17m £3.74m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £43.16k £31.54k £18.64k £3.99k £2.11k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.03m £3.84m £3.84m £4.07m £3.95m
Expenditure - Raising funds £15.06k £14.74k £4.31k £6.46k £3.93k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £18.00k £104.50k £10.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0