Accounts and annual returns PAYHEMBURY PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1108524
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 24 February 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2013 24 April 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2012 31 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 31 May 2013 On Time