THE DAVID JEFFRIES CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist in furthering the relief of poverty, the advancement of the Christian faith and the advancement of education in any part of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- India
Governance
- 23 May 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VERONICA JEFFERIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM BIEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON CHARLES LOVELESS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID VAN JEFFRIES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JONATHAN JEFFERIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.40k | £1.25k | £1 | £9 | £22 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.24k | £5.78k | £1.02k | £200 | £2.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 January 2025 | 346 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 February 2022 | 367 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON 28TH MAY 2002 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED 28TH APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND IN ANY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 WEST STREET
HASLEMERE
SURREY
GU27 2AN
- Phone:
- 01428642321
- Email:
- loveless@potterowtram.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window