Accounts and annual returns BACCAY TRUST

Charity number: 1109883
Charity reporting is overdue by 1496 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
Accounts and TAR 07 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
Annual return 07 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 400 days
Accounts and TAR 07 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 400 days
Annual return 07 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 766 days
Accounts and TAR 07 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 766 days
Annual return 07 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1131 days
Accounts and TAR 07 June 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1131 days
Annual return 07 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1496 days
Accounts and TAR 07 June 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1496 days