BRISTOL CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouse provision, day services provision and development and grant giving. The Trustees have agreed that the prime objective can be summed up as "Enhancing Quality of Life for Older People in our Communities"
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,465,393
Donations and legacies | £80.32k | |
Charitable activities | £2.23m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.12m | |
Other | £27.02k |
Total expenditure:
£2,483,733
Raising funds | £331.55k | |
Charitable activities | £2.15m | |
Other | £2.52k |
-£428,926 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £19,434 from 1 government contract(s) and £796,883 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £334.06k | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.15m | |
Retained for future use | £981.66k |
People

19 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 22 August 2005: Standard registration
- 17 March 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Street | Chair | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Yeandle | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Anita Nkolisa Woodburn | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Be McCarroll | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
RONI NII KWAME ADJEI | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAULA CARDWELL | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Rachel Jones | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Keith Anthony Hicks | Trustee | 21 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dunn BA | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mary Howell | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Guise Mennell MSc MCIH | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Lettice Spencer BSc RIBA | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nolan Ellis Webber FCSI | Trustee | 27 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.27m | £1.95m | £2.10m | £2.33m | £3.47m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.18m | £1.97m | £2.32m | £2.42m | £2.48m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £19.43k | |
|
Income from government grants | £325.06k | £35.28k | £28.90k | £34.58k | £796.88k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.37k | £1.38k | £9.49k | £1.37k | £80.32k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.38m | £1.21m | £1.32m | £1.32m | £2.23m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £662.28k | £478.06k | £749.64k | £999.36k | £1.12m | |
|
Income - Other | £218.48k | £257.47k | £20.66k | £11.35k | £27.02k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.17m | £1.96m | £2.10m | £2.15m | £2.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £218.32k | £261.09k | £331.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £30.21k | £29.22k | £27.17k | £29.22k | £43.08k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £118.57k | £124.60k | £90.37k | £89.65k | £65.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £218.32k | £261.09k | £331.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.91k | £2.97k | £3.40k | £4.93k | £2.52k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £20.63m | £20.25m | £19.85m | £19.42m | £19.14m | |
|
Long-term investments | £13.69m | £16.35m | £18.78m | £17.82m | £18.58m | |
|
Other assets | £8.10m | £5.40m | £3.19m | £3.59m | £2.92m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£200.06k | -£177.06k | -£52.21k | -£24.05k | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.46m | £1.39m | £1.26m | £1.21m | £489.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE,CITY OF BRISTOL, NORTH SOMERSET, AND SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE.
Linked charities
- ALDERMAN JOHN WHITSON'S NON-EDUCATIONAL CHARITIES
- ALDERMAN JOSEPH JACKSON EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
- ALICE COLE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
- BARRY THEO JONES FUND
- BONVILLE EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
- BRISTOL CHARITIES COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- BRISTOL CHARITIES SERVICES
- BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES' RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
- BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES' RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
- BRISTOL RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND DISABILITY CHARITY
- CHARITY OF ROBERT FURBER FOR MINISTERS SALARY
- DR CHARLES SLOPER
- DR GEORGE OWEN
- GEORGE HARRINGTON EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
- MISS ANN CASAMAJOR
- ORCHARD HOMES
- PERRETT'S HOMES
- REGINALD WILLIAMS MEMORIAL
- REVEREND DR THOMAS WHITE'S ESSEX ESTATES
- REVEREND DR THOMAS WHITE'S GRAY'S INN LANE TRUST
- RICHARD HUGHES
- RICHARD HUGHES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
- SAMUEL GIST EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
- SIR ABRAHAM ELTON EDUCATIONAL CHARITY
- STOKES CROFT ALMSHOUSES
- THE BRISTOL LYING IN INSTITUTION
- THE CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES OF THE PARISH OF WESTBURY ON TRYM
- THE ELLA MARY MERCHANT TRUST FUND
- THE FURBER POOR FUND
- THE HOOKS MILLS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
- THE JACKSON-ROECKEL TEACHERS PROVIDENT ASSOCIATION
- THE SOLDIER'S CORNER IN ARNOS VALE CEMETERY
- WCF BLACKMORE'S GIFT
- 22 August 2005 : Standard registration
- 17 March 2015 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VASSALL CENTRE
GILL AVENUE
FISHPONDS
BRISTOL
BS16 2QQ
- Phone:
- 01179300301
- Email:
- info@bristolcharities.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window