BARRACK'S LANE COMMUNITY GARDEN PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 June 2005: Standard registration
- 07 December 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 07 December 2006: Funds transferred to 1116544 BARRACKS LANE COMMUNITY GARDEN
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED ON 3 MAY 2005.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN A PUBLIC GARDEN OR GARDENS FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE OXFORD AREA AND OTHERS (THE BENEFICIARIES) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID BENEFICIARIES AND TO PROMOTE, DEVELOP AND SUPPORT COMMUNITY LED GARDENING INITIATIVES IN THE OXFORD AREA GENERALLY. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE AREA OF THE ENVIRONMENT, ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL DIMENSIONS OF SUSTAINABILITY AND BIODIVERSITY BY THE DEVELOPMENT AND DELIVERY OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES INCLUDING VEGETABLE AND FLOWER GROWING, WASTE MANAGEMENT AND THE USE OF RENEWABLE ENERGY SOURCES.
Area of benefit
THE OXFORD AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window