STEVENAGE WORLD FORUM FOR ETHNIC COMMUNITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support ethnic community groups (members) by building their capacity through provision or resources and assistance within the boundaries of our funding. We do this by provision of free services with admin and office support, access to computers and internet, meeting room. We provide limited help with funding applications, networking, training, counselling and advocacy. Annual Celebrate event
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 15 November 2005: Standard registration
- SWF (Working name)
- WORLD FORUM (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carolina Veres | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Elaine Connolly | Trustee | 14 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Juddy Otti Akello | Trustee | 14 July 2014 |
|
|
||||||
Charanjit Kang | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Kate Belinis DL | Trustee |
|
||||||||
MS PEGGY LYONS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.19k | £40.27k | £40.27k | £11.58k | £7.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.09k | £26.72k | £26.72k | £29.46k | £22.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £7.43k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 OCTOBER 2000 AS AMENDED 13 JULY 2005 AND 13 JULY 2010.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FORUM ARE TO: (A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS, AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE INHABITANTS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE ETHNIC MINORITY COMMUNITIES, OF STEVENAGE AND THE NEIGHBOURING AREAS (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (B) PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF GOOD RACE RELATIONS BETWEEN DIFFERING RACIAL GROUPS BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. (C) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS. (D) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE FORUM SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
STEVENAGE AND THE NEIGHBOURING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sherma Batson CENTRE
10-12 EXCHANGE ROAD
BEDWELL
STEVENAGE
HERTFORDSHIRE
SG1 1PZ
- Phone:
- 01438725400
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window