FRIENDS OF THE NORTH BRADLEY PROGRESSIVE HALL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 08 September 2005: Standard registration
- 06 March 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2018 | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190 | £249 | £229 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2019 | 14 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST WITH THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND OPERATION OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORTH BRADLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS, OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
NORTH BRADLEY AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window