RPFC

Charity number: 1108896
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE OBJECTS OF THE RPFC ARE TO RELIEVE NEED AMONGST WIDOWS, WIDOWERS, CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS OF THOSE WHO HAVE SERVED IN THE ARMED FORCES OR RESERVE FORCES OF THE CROWN.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009

Total income: £143,831
Total expenditure: £273,804

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 June 2007: Standard registration
  • 04 September 2008: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
  • 04 September 2008: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • ROYAL PATRIOTIC FUND CORPORATION (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £0 £175.11k £182.12k £166.79k £143.83k
Total expenditure £0 £341.48k £334.36k £334.36k £273.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 14 September 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2009 26 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 02 July 2010 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2008 11 June 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 25 June 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2007 28 July 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 28 July 2008 On Time

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 15 NOVEMBER 1901 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF 3 JANUARY 1961 AND 24 APRIL 2007.
Charitable objects
GRANTING ANNUITIES TO LADIES IN REDUCED CIRCUMSTANCES AND BEING THE WIDOWS OR UNMARRIED DAUGHTERS OF OFFICERS OF HER MAJESTY'S ARMY INCLUSIVE OF THE ROYAL MARINES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 28 June 2007 : Standard registration
  • 04 September 2008 : Removed
  • 04 September 2008 : Asset transfer out