HASLEMERE SCHOOLS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTIVES ARE ACHIEVED IN A VARIETY OF WAYS INVOLVING TH GOVERNORS OF ST BARTHOLOMEW'S SCHOOL, THE RECTOR AND CHURCHWARDENS OF THE PARISH OF HASLEMERE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 19 September 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.12k | £9.90k | £10.40k | £12.11k | £13.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £227 | £15.75k | £4.29k | £4.03k | £16.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 31ST MAY 1983
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (A) IN MAKING PAYMENTS TO THE GOVERNORS FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE SCHOOLS TO BE APPLIED BY THEM IN DISCHARGING THEIR RESPECTIVE OBLIGATIONS UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS 1944 TO 1981 WITH RESPECT TO THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOLS. (B) IN OR TOWARDS PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR THE SCHOOLS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOLS. (C) IN PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE TOWN OF HASLEMERE AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: (I) IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL AND TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED FOR THE PURPOSE BY THE TRUSTEES (II) IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS) TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICES ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS PLEASE SEE CLAUSES 20 AND 23 OF SCHEME)
Area of benefit
TOWN OF HASLEMERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 PINE VIEW CLOSE
HASLEMERE
GU27 1DU
- Phone:
- 01428642445
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window