Accounts and annual returns PLYMOUTH WOMEN'S AID LIMITED

Charity Number: 1110015
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 10 March 2009 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 29 December 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 20 March 2008 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 23 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 22 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 17 January 2007 On Time