PLYMOUTH WOMEN'S AID LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relieve the distress and suffering of women and children who have suffered or exposed to doemstic abuse.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 15 June 2005: Standard registration
- 09 December 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PLYMOUTH WOMEN'S AID (Working name)
- PWA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £364.04k | £334.85k | £162.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £355.13k | £358.05k | £176.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 10 March 2009 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 29 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 20 March 2008 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 23 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 22 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 17 January 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
A) RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE EXPOSED TO DOMESTIC ABUSE. B) EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF ALL FORMS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE AGAINST WOMEN AND THE PREVENTION THEREOF, AND TO UNDERTAKE OR CONTRIBUTE TO RESEARCH IN TO SUCH MATTERS AND PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. PLYMOUTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window