THE NATIONAL COUNCIL OF HINDU PRIESTS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our Council members are promoting good understanding of Hinduism and building bridges amongst the multi-faith Britain. there is harmonious atmosphere across UK where our Hindu Priests members are working. All our NCHP members are unpaid volunteers and supporting the communities where there is a need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ACHARYA KRISHAN KANT ATTRI | Chair |
|
||||||
ACHARYA PREM SHARMA PREM GHIMIRE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ACHARYA DHARM DUTT VASISHTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PANDIT RAMESH KUMAR SHARMA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/04/2020 | 03/04/2021 | 03/04/2022 | 03/04/2023 | 03/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £180 | £180 | £180 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2023 | 29 May 2024 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 April 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE HINDU RELIGION AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF HINDUS AND TO WORK FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF INTER-FAITH RELATIONSHIPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Wentworth Court
Ponteland
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE20 9PR
- Phone:
- 01661 872958
- Email:
- contact@hindupriests.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window