Home Start Havering & Redbridge Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Home-Start Havering offers both emotional and practical support to families across the London Borough of Havering who have a child under the age of five by recruiting and training volunteers who are then matched with a family who they visit on a regular basis in their own home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £60,000 from 2 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Havering
- Redbridge
Governance
- 14 March 2005: Standard registration
- Home-Start Havering & Redbridge (Working name)
- HOME-START HAVERING (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leena Phillips | Trustee | 23 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Arthur Sambridge | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Owen Bentley | Trustee | 16 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Latham | Trustee | 26 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.97k | £89.47k | £119.32k | £123.13k | £186.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.99k | £100.79k | £87.93k | £128.72k | £182.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £4.87k | N/A | N/A | £60.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.56k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 FEBRUARY 2005. as amended on 18 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
3.1 TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH , BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; 3.2 TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; 3.3 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; 3.4 . TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF HAVERING AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
HAVERING AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Damyns Hall Aerodrome Ltd
Damyns Hall Aerodrome
Aveley Road
UPMINSTER
Essex
RM14 2TN
- Phone:
- 01708455551
- Email:
- info@homestarthavering.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window