SHEFFIELD COUNTRYSIDE CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Countryside Conservation, working with local communities and other volunteers, offering skills training. We also offer team building events. Environmental education with school groups in the wider community, in school grounds and at the Countryside Centre. Also with other groups of all ages. Organising events with schools and local communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £42,953 from 2 government contract(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 05 September 2005: Standard registration
- SCCT (Working name)
- SHEFFIELD COUNTRYSIDE CONSERVATION TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter John Ibbotson | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Benham | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD STANLEY PEARSON | Trustee | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MONTEYNE B SC | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEREMY PLATTS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.52k | £109.46k | £92.07k | £162.64k | £82.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £83.85k | £104.29k | £114.80k | £118.15k | £95.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £87.76k | £71.13k | N/A | £42.95k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £48.59k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 March 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 February 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 March 2021 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 JANUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 5 AUGUST 2005.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL, NATURAL AND BUILT ENVIRONMENT OF SHEFFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. (B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR APPROPRIATE RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION COMMENSURATE WITH (A) ABOVE. (C) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL AND HERITAGE MATTERS IN SHEFFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AND THE WAYS OF SUSTAINING, CONSERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE SAME.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOOD LANE COUNTRYSIDE CENTRE
WOOD LANE
SHEFFIELD
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
S6 5HE
- Phone:
- 01142316982
- Email:
- johnmonteyne@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window