BROMSGROVE DISTRICT HOUSING TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1111423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The management of housing for people in need of affordable housing and related services in Bromsgrove and the surrounding areas.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for being a trustee.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City
  • Worcestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 September 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Jeffrey Saunders Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Helen Elizabeth Scarrett Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Hiten Patel Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
ANNMARIE LOUISE HULLEY Trustee 18 July 2022
None on record
ANDREW KILBY Trustee 18 July 2022
None on record
Dean Gill Trustee 19 July 2021
None on record
Hannah Purdie Trustee 15 July 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Nkiruka Ogbanufe-Nembhard Trustee 15 July 2019
None on record
MOHAN SINGH SANDHAR Trustee 03 December 2018
None on record
Alison Fisher Trustee 03 December 2018
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF GEORGE FENTHAM, HAMPTON IN ARDEN
Received: On time
GEORGE FENTHAM HAMPTON IN ARDEN CHARITY
Received: On time
BOURNVILLE VILLAGE TRUST
Received: On time
MARY STIFF Trustee 11 July 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £25.86m £24.83m £24.87m £24.81m £27.48m
Total expenditure £20.33m £19.81m £20.99m £23.09m £25.10m
Income from government contracts £303.38k £303.74k £303.74k £323.78k £414.68k
Income from government grants £1.03m £899.00k £360.00k £1.06m £223.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £24.56m £23.88m £23.35m £23.77m £26.35m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £31.00k £53.00k £25.00k £176.00k £221.00k
Income - Other £1.27m £901.00k £1.50m £863.00k £907.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £20.33m £19.81m £20.99m £23.09m £25.10m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £50.66k £44.54k £53.34k £63.31k £57.66k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £139.56m £148.57m £156.46m £168.78m £179.25m
Long-term investments £9.72m £10.60m £11.74m £12.30m £13.57m
Other assets £14.12m £26.63m £24.36m £14.75m £8.29m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£6.56m -£7.69m -£6.28m -£398.00k -£466.00k
Total liabilities £101.97m £118.34m £119.37m £119.79m £121.72m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
BUNTSFORD COURT
BUNTSFORD GATE
BROMSGROVE
WORCESTERSHIRE
B60 3DJ
Phone:
0800 085 0160