EXTANT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Extant is Britain's leading professional arts company of visually impaired people. Extant's mission is to promote the arts and culture of the visually impaired community through the performing arts. Extant presents an annual programme of Productions and Touring, Research and Development, Education and Youth, and Training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Flintshire
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 March 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Woolley | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Cartino | Trustee | 22 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jane Allen | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miranda Celeste Debenham | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Whiteley | Trustee | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Ruth Greenhill | Trustee | 22 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Rachel Mazorodze | Trustee | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shamim Ali | Trustee | 03 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Victoria Jane Harrison | Trustee | 28 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Mary Elizabeth Paterson | Trustee | 10 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.63k | £185.67k | £216.44k | £302.17k | £305.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.09k | £147.97k | £199.30k | £333.32k | £258.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 AUGUST 2004.
Charitable objects
(A) TO FURTHER THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT AND GENERAL DEVELOPMENT OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PEOPLE, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF THE ARTS AND THE PERFORMING ARTS, THAT ARE EITHER INSPIRED, INSTIGATED, ORGANISED OR FACILITATED WHERE POSSIBLE BY VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE. (B) TO RELIEVE POVERTY DISTRESS AND SUFFERING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD (INCLUDING DISEASE SICKNESS OR MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY) AND WHETHER ARISING FROM ANY PUBLIC CALAMITY OR OTHERWISE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2.06 Carlton Mansions
Brixton House
385 Coldharbour Lane
London
SW9 8GL
- Phone:
- 02078203737
- Email:
- info@extant.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window