FERNWOOD JUNIOR SCHOOL CHILDRENS ACCOUNT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of our fund are to subsidize school trips and residential visits for children attending our school. If families with low income cannot afford the trips our school fund will help in many cases, rather than a child not attending.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Nottingham City
Governance
- 12 July 2005: Standard registration
- 23 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- FERNWOOD JUNIOR SCHOOL SCHOOL FUND (Working name)
- SCHOOL FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.38k | £76.68k | £56.46k | £53.75k | £53.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.81k | £66.49k | £55.80k | £52.91k | £52.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 13 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2015
(These accounts |
26 February 2016 | 26 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 17 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
17 September 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20 JANUARY 2005 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTARY DEED DATED 29 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF FERNWOOD JUNIOR SCHOOL(HEREINAFTER CALLED THE 'TRUST FUND' BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY OR THE DEPARTMENT FOR EDUCATION AND EMPLOYMENT (DFEE)
Area of benefit
FERNWOOD NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window