Accounts and annual returns THE COMMUNITY ARTS THERAPIES (CAT) PROJECT

Charity number: 1108703
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2013 05 May 2014 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2013 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2012 10 February 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2012 Not Required